THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Harbour St
Toronto ON M5J 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-613-0333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Oklahoma

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Harbour St
Toronto ON M5J 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-613-0333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Oklahoma

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASPREET KAUR KHUN-KHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHUN-KHUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASPREET KAUR KHUN-KHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHUN-KHUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018