THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:08:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Health Centre of Maple
1 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)8323838
Extension: 1
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-10425 Kennedy Rd
ON, L6Z 0A4
Brampton ON L6Z 0A4
Phone: (905) 846-7611
Fax: (905) 846-7753

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tazeen Al-Haq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Al-Haq (CPSO#: 117045 )
Business Address: The Health Centre of Maple
1-2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 1R8
(905) 832-3838 Extn: 1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Health Centre of Maple
1 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)8323838
Extension: 1
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-10425 Kennedy Rd
ON, L6Z 0A4
Brampton ON L6Z 0A4
Phone: (905) 846-7611
Fax: (905) 846-7753

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tazeen Al-Haq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Al-Haq (CPSO#: 117045 )
Business Address: The Health Centre of Maple
1-2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 1R8
(905) 832-3838 Extn: 1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAZEEN FATIMA AL-HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HAQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAZEEN FATIMA AL-HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HAQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018