THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:54:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6479488895
Fax: 4313170636

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 27 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Shiraz University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6479488895
Fax: 4313170636

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 27 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEDA ANSSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSSARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEDA ANSSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSSARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019