THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:56:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Trinity College Dublin School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 902-563-2007
Fax: 902-567-7918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Trinity College Dublin School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 902-563-2007
Fax: 902-567-7918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VHARI ELIZABETH JAMES-BARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES-BARNETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VHARI ELIZABETH JAMES-BARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES-BARNETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Trinity College Dublin School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2018