THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:52:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Psychiatry, inpatient unit
Burr wing, Floor 4.
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Psychiatry, inpatient unit
Burr wing, Floor 4.
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Mar 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AMINA NASAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of Adult Psychiatry, Queen's University, in which Dr. NASAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. NASAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. NASAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. NASAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. NASAR's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AMINA NASAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of Adult Psychiatry, Queen's University, in which Dr. NASAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. NASAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. NASAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. NASAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. NASAR's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018