THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:06:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pittsburgh, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Pathology
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-6060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 29 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Pittsburgh, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Pathology
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-6060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 29 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Mar 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 12 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Lananh Ngoc Nguyen may practise medicine independently in anatomical
pathology and neuropathology.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Lananh Ngoc Nguyen may practise medicine independently in anatomical
pathology and neuropathology.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pittsburgh, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018