THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:05:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1910 Leslie Street
Unit 3
Sharon Medical Clinic
Sharon Ontario L0G 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 478 1300
Fax: 905 478 1303

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1910 Leslie Street
Unit 3
Sharon Medical Clinic
Sharon Ontario L0G 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 478 1300
Fax: 905 478 1303

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZZA KHOGALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOGALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZZA KHOGALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOGALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 May 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 May 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2018