THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:23:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Wellness Centre
722-115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167436063
Fax: 4167430101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Wellness Centre
722-115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167436063
Fax: 4167430101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Mar 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 12 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Emy Susan Abraham may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Emy Susan Abraham may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018