THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1960 Appleby Line
Suite 36
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 332-9292
Fax: (905) 332-9244
Address: 1662 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9B 1K5
Phone: (905) 524-1712
Fax: (905) 544-2030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 12 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1960 Appleby Line
Suite 36
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 332-9292
Fax: (905) 332-9244
Address: 1662 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9B 1K5
Phone: (905) 524-1712
Fax: (905) 544-2030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 12 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Mar 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 12 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eva Kovacs may practise medicine independently in rheumatology.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eva Kovacs may practise medicine independently in rheumatology.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2018