THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:07:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1901 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 483-0102
Fax: (416) 483-9393
Address: 366 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 1H4
Phone: (416) 926-1006
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1188 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4J 1M3
Phone: 416 778 6777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1901 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 483-0102
Fax: (416) 483-9393
Address: 366 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 1H4
Phone: (416) 926-1006
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1188 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4J 1M3
Phone: 416 778 6777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAYLOR JOSEPH CALDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAYLOR JOSEPH CALDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2018