THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 08:09:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Oncology
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Providence Health Care
Department of Geriatrics
Room C210
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1
Phone: 416-285-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Oncology
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Providence Health Care
Department of Geriatrics
Room C210
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1
Phone: 416-285-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BERNARD BUTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BERNARD BUTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2018