THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:19:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Pediatric Gastroenterology
17 Jan 2023 to 10 Feb 2023
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatric Gastroenterology
14 Jan 2019 to 08 Feb 2019
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 17 Jan 2023 to 10 Feb 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 14 Jan 2019 to 08 Feb 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2019