THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 350-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058471133
Fax: 9058479782

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rashid Mazoor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 350-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058471133
Fax: 9058479782

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rashid Mazoor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHID MANZOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANZOOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHID MANZOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANZOOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2018