THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:06:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1730 Bishop St N
Cambridge ON N1T 1N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195781500
Fax: 5198003732
Address: 348 Bronte St S
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Unit 8
Milton ON L9T 5B6
Phone: 905-997-0888
Fax: 416-850-9993

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1730 Bishop St N
Cambridge ON N1T 1N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195781500
Fax: 5198003732
Address: 348 Bronte St S
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Unit 8
Milton ON L9T 5B6
Phone: 905-997-0888
Fax: 416-850-9993

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WHITNEY KATHERINE SHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WHITNEY KATHERINE SHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2019