THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:44:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
05 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2019 to 04 Feb 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 05 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2019 to 04 Feb 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019