THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:35:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
26 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
16 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jan 2019 to 15 Mar 2019
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jan 2019 to 25 Mar 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 26 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 16 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jan 2019 to 15 Mar 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jan 2019 to 25 Mar 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2019