THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:03:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 722 3443
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amal Ghobrial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 722 3443
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amal Ghobrial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAL TALAAT WISSA GHOBRIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOBRIAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMAL TALAAT WISSA GHOBRIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOBRIAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2019