THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 225 James St S
RAAM Clinic
Hamilton ON L8P 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 35800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 225 James St S
RAAM Clinic
Hamilton ON L8P 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 35800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOSH WASSEGIJIG MIZZAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIZZAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOSH WASSEGIJIG MIZZAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIZZAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2019