THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:36:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1315 Finch Ave W
Netcare Health Group
Dr. Madu's Practice.
Suite 201
North York ON M3J 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 437 880 7728
Extension: N/A
Fax: N/A

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 20 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1315 Finch Ave W
Netcare Health Group
Dr. Madu's Practice.
Suite 201
North York ON M3J 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 437 880 7728
Extension: N/A
Fax: N/A

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 20 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
11 May 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 11 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from May 11, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ikechukwu Steven Madu in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Madu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. IKECHUKWU STEVEN MADU
(“Dr. Madu”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Committee” means the Discipline Committee of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Madu, certificate of registration number 117430, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1111511 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my obstetrics and gynecology practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Madu, undertake that in Ontario:

(i) I will not advertise or otherwise hold myself out to be a high-risk obstetrician, unless and until such time as I have been certified by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada as a subspecialist in Maternal-Fetal Medicine; and

(ii) I will not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation unless and until I have relocated my practice to Ontario on a full-time basis and have obtained active, admitting privileges at an Ontario hospital that provides complete obstetrical services.

(6) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Madu, undertake that, during the time period that I am subject to the restriction in (5)(a)(ii) above, I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations in Ontario, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.” For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Madu does not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

(b) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (6)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations in Ontario, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.”

(c) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Madu, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (6)(d).

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations a minimum of fourteen (14) days in advance of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Madu, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Madu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(12) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(13) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Madu engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his obstetrics and gynecology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Madu will not advertise or hold himself out to be a high-risk obstetrician or provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation until and unless certain conditions have been met.

During the time period that Dr. Madu is restricted from providing care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks, he shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Madu does not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Madu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from May 11, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ikechukwu Steven Madu in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Madu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. IKECHUKWU STEVEN MADU
(“Dr. Madu”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Committee” means the Discipline Committee of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Madu, certificate of registration number 117430, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1111511 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my obstetrics and gynecology practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Madu, undertake that in Ontario:

(i) I will not advertise or otherwise hold myself out to be a high-risk obstetrician, unless and until such time as I have been certified by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada as a subspecialist in Maternal-Fetal Medicine; and

(ii) I will not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation unless and until I have relocated my practice to Ontario on a full-time basis and have obtained active, admitting privileges at an Ontario hospital that provides complete obstetrical services.

(6) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Madu, undertake that, during the time period that I am subject to the restriction in (5)(a)(ii) above, I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations in Ontario, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.” For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Madu does not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

(b) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (6)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations in Ontario, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “A.”

(c) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Madu, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (6)(d).

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Madu, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations a minimum of fourteen (14) days in advance of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Madu, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Madu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(12) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(13) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Madu, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Madu engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his obstetrics and gynecology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Madu will not advertise or hold himself out to be a high-risk obstetrician or provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation until and unless certain conditions have been met.

During the time period that Dr. Madu is restricted from providing care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks, he shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Madu does not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Madu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Aug 2023
Summary:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Madu engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his obstetrics and gynecology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Madu:
 
• Will not advertise or otherwise hold himself out to be a high-risk obstetrician, unless and until such time as he has been certified by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada as a subspecialist in Maternal-Fetal Medicine; and
 
• Will not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation unless and until he has relocated his practice to Ontario on a full-time basis and has obtained active, admitting privileges at an Ontario hospital that provides complete obstetrical services.
 
During the time period that Dr. Madu is restricted from providing care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks, he shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
 
“Dr. Madu does not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Aug 2023
Summary:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Madu engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his obstetrics and gynecology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Madu:
 
• Will not advertise or otherwise hold himself out to be a high-risk obstetrician, unless and until such time as he has been certified by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada as a subspecialist in Maternal-Fetal Medicine; and
 
• Will not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation unless and until he has relocated his practice to Ontario on a full-time basis and has obtained active, admitting privileges at an Ontario hospital that provides complete obstetrical services.
 
During the time period that Dr. Madu is restricted from providing care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks, he shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
 
“Dr. Madu does not provide care to obstetrical patients beyond 28 weeks gestation. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
 
 

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 Nov 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 May 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 11 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 11 May 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 11 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2019