THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:31:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 26 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 26 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Respirology
25 Oct 2021 to 21 Nov 2021
University of Ottawa
EL - Respirology
30 Aug 2021 to 24 Oct 2021
University of Toronto
EL - Internal Medicine
11 Mar 2019 to 07 Apr 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 25 Oct 2021 to 21 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Respirology
DATE: 30 Aug 2021 to 24 Oct 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Internal Medicine
DATE: 11 Mar 2019 to 07 Apr 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2019