THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:51:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JOSEPH SEHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEHL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JOSEPH SEHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEHL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2019