THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
13 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Feb 2019 to 12 Apr 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 13 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2019 to 12 Apr 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2019