THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:42:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
EL - Gastroenterology
08 Apr 2019 to 05 May 2019
Queen's University
EL - Gastroenterology
11 Feb 2019 to 10 Mar 2019
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 08 Apr 2019 to 05 May 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 11 Feb 2019 to 10 Mar 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2019