THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:11:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 164 Eglinton Avenue East
North Toronto Neurology
Suite 508
Toronto Ontario M4P 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474771073
Fax: 4168607559

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 23 Aug 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 164 Eglinton Avenue East
North Toronto Neurology
Suite 508
Toronto Ontario M4P 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474771073
Fax: 4168607559

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 23 Aug 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Aug 2024
24 Aug 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 08 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 24 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOHANN CHRISTIAN LUDWIG MICALLEF may practise neurology with North Toronto Neurology in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on August 24, 2025 or when Dr. MICALLEF’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MICALLEF’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MICALLEF’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 August, 2021, and will expire on or before 24 August, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOHANN CHRISTIAN LUDWIG MICALLEF may practise neurology with North Toronto Neurology in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on August 24, 2025 or when Dr. MICALLEF’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MICALLEF’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MICALLEF’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 August, 2021, and will expire on or before 24 August, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 24 Aug 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2019