THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306 Rideau St
Ottawa ON K1N 5Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134540321
Fax: 6136800411
Address: 257-346 John St N
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
Phone: 6136225763
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2006 Robertson Road
Unit 15
Ottawa Ontario K2H 1A5
Phone: (613) 596-0911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306 Rideau St
Ottawa ON K1N 5Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134540321
Fax: 6136800411
Address: 257-346 John St N
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
Phone: 6136225763
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2006 Robertson Road
Unit 15
Ottawa Ontario K2H 1A5
Phone: (613) 596-0911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 909 Stn Main
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRA IVANNA PAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAVAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRA IVANNA PAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAVAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2019