THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:16:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Center
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6692
Fax: 4377479396

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Center
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6692
Fax: 4377479396

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DREW CAUGHLIN BROTHERSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROTHERSTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DREW CAUGHLIN BROTHERSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROTHERSTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019