THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:32:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 May 2024
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHINMAY BERA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical fellowship program in adult gastroenterology in which Dr. BERA is enrolled in the Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, University of Toronto;

2. Dr. BERA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BERA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

3. Dr. BERA shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

4. The certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHINMAY BERA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical fellowship program in adult gastroenterology in which Dr. BERA is enrolled in the Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, University of Toronto;

2. Dr. BERA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BERA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

3. Dr. BERA shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

4. The certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calcutta, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
16 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 15 May 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
16 May 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
01 Mar 2019 to 15 May 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 16 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 15 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 16 May 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Mar 2019 to 15 May 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 May 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 May 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2019