THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:45:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Otolaryngology -
Head and Neck Surgery
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Otolaryngology -
Head and Neck Surgery
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUMANA A A H HUSSAIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HUSSAIN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HUSSAIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HUSSAIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HUSSAIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HUSSAIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HUSSAIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUMANA A A H HUSSAIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HUSSAIN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HUSSAIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HUSSAIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HUSSAIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HUSSAIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HUSSAIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
14 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 13 Jul 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
14 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 13 Jul 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
PEAP - R - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
08 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 14 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 13 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 14 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 13 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 08 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2019