THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Auckland, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kerr Street Medical Centre
344 Kerr St
Oakville Ontario L6K 3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 845 8000
Fax: 905 845 8002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Auckland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kerr Street Medical Centre
344 Kerr St
Oakville Ontario L6K 3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 845 8000
Fax: 905 845 8002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY PETER SPEIRS WOODCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODCOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY PETER SPEIRS WOODCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODCOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Auckland, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2019