THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:18:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Adult Psychiatry - Johnson 5
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-3400
Extension: 2551
Fax: 613-548-6095

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Mar 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
Adult Psychiatry - Johnson 5
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-3400
Extension: 2551
Fax: 613-548-6095

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Mar 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Apr 2022
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 25 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Rafael Christophe da Rocha Freire may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Adult Psychiatry, Queen's University, in
which Dr. Christophe da Rocha Freire holds an academic appointment
at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Christophe
da Rocha Freire no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on March 22, 2019, and expires on June 30, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Christophe da Rocha Freire's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Rafael Christophe da Rocha Freire may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Adult Psychiatry, Queen's University, in
which Dr. Christophe da Rocha Freire holds an academic appointment
at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Christophe
da Rocha Freire no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on March 22, 2019, and expires on June 30, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Christophe da Rocha Freire's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2019