THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:05:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-100
Extension: 40527
Fax: 905-527-0059

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-100
Extension: 40527
Fax: 905-527-0059

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 May 2023
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MANUEL LEONARDO HERRERA ARAMBURU may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, McMaster University, in which Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 09 May, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MANUEL LEONARDO HERRERA ARAMBURU may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, McMaster University, in which Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 09 May, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. HERRERA ARAMBURU's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 May 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2019