THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6175 Highway 7
iHealth Centre
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 26 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6175 Highway 7
iHealth Centre
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 26 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIL AKBAR JAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIL AKBAR JAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2019