THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:33:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-524 Oxford St W
London ON N6H 1T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-473-5454
Fax: 519-474-0765
Address: 2-1195 Hyde Park Rd
London ON N6H 5K6
Phone: (519) 474-0996
Fax: 519-472-3760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-524 Oxford St W
London ON N6H 1T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-473-5454
Fax: 519-474-0765
Address: 2-1195 Hyde Park Rd
London ON N6H 5K6
Phone: (519) 474-0996
Fax: 519-472-3760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IFRAH AHMED HASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IFRAH AHMED HASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2019