THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:05:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169786976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169786976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD F H H HASAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HASAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HASAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HASAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HASAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HASAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HASAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD F H H HASAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HASAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HASAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HASAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HASAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HASAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HASAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jan 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
25 Jun 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Obstetrics and Gynecology
15 Apr 2019 to 24 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 25 Jun 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 15 Apr 2019 to 24 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2019