THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:26:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Ophthalmology
Suite W3248 Box 307
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Ophthalmology
Suite W3248 Box 307
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(3) Dr. KREIMEI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KREIMEI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KREIMEI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD A A M A KREIMEI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KREIMEI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. KREIMEI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KREIMEI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(3) Dr. KREIMEI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KREIMEI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KREIMEI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD A A M A KREIMEI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KREIMEI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. KREIMEI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KREIMEI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Aug 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
29 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Aug 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
29 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
29 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2022 to 28 Jul 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
29 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2021 to 28 Jul 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
29 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2020 to 28 Jul 2020
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
PEAP - R - Ophthalmology
08 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 28 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 29 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 28 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 29 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 29 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 28 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 29 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 28 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 29 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 28 Jul 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Ophthalmology
DATE: 08 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2019