THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: NEW YORK MEDICAL COLLEGE, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Endocrinology
12EN room 215
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3772
Fax: 416-340-5223
Address: 60 Murray St
Fred A. Litwin Family Centre In Genetic Medicine
3rd floor, Suite 400
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: 416 586 4800
Extension: 4220
Fax: 416 619 5523

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: NEW YORK MEDICAL COLLEGE, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Endocrinology
12EN room 215
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3772
Fax: 416-340-5223
Address: 60 Murray St
Fred A. Litwin Family Centre In Genetic Medicine
3rd floor, Suite 400
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: 416 586 4800
Extension: 4220
Fax: 416 619 5523

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARI MORGENTHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGENTHAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARI MORGENTHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGENTHAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: NEW YORK MEDICAL COLLEGE, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019