THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Regina St S
Region of Waterloo Public Health & Paramedic Services
3rd Floor
Waterloo ON N2J 4V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 575-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Main Street West
McMaster Family Practice
3rd Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-546-9885
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Regina St S
Region of Waterloo Public Health & Paramedic Services
3rd Floor
Waterloo ON N2J 4V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 575-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Main Street West
McMaster Family Practice
3rd Floor
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-546-9885
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADELLE-LISA CHANG ON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG ON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADELLE-LISA CHANG ON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG ON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019