THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:50:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
190 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
190 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIE SAMANTHA RAMPERSAD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RAMPERSAD is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. RAMPERSAD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAMPERSAD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAMPERSAD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RAMPERSAD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RAMPERSAD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIE SAMANTHA RAMPERSAD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RAMPERSAD is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. RAMPERSAD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAMPERSAD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAMPERSAD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RAMPERSAD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RAMPERSAD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 8 - Nephrology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
04 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
EL - Nephrology
05 May 2022 to 01 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
EL - Nephrology
03 Jun 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 8 - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 04 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Nephrology
DATE: 05 May 2022 to 01 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Nephrology
DATE: 03 Jun 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019