THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:55:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 19 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Elisa Macedo Brietzke may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Adult Psychiatry, Queen's University, in
which Dr. Macedo Brietzke holds an academic appointment at the rank
of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Macedo
Brietzke no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on May 3, 2019, and expires on June 30, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Macedo Brietzke's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Elisa Macedo Brietzke may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Adult Psychiatry, Queen's University, in
which Dr. Macedo Brietzke holds an academic appointment at the rank
of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Macedo
Brietzke no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on May 3, 2019, and expires on June 30, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Macedo Brietzke's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 May 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 May 2019