THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:05:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
university of ottawa
heart institute
1280 Main Street West
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 409 Taché Ave
st. boniface general hospital
Bergan Cardiac sciences center
Winnipeg MB R2H 2A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
university of ottawa
heart institute
1280 Main Street West
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 409 Taché Ave
st. boniface general hospital
Bergan Cardiac sciences center
Winnipeg MB R2H 2A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAS SALEH A ALZAHRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALZAHRANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAS SALEH A ALZAHRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALZAHRANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Apr 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2019