THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:31:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gulf Medical University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Victoria Ave
PO Box 360
South East Grey Community Health Center
Markdale ON N0C 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-986-2222
Fax: 519-986-3999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramsha Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Gulf Medical University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Victoria Ave
PO Box 360
South East Grey Community Health Center
Markdale ON N0C 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-986-2222
Fax: 519-986-3999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramsha Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMSHA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMSHA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gulf Medical University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019