THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gahlon, Rajaat (Used Until: 28 Aug 2019)
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 321 - 50 Sunny Meadow Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6R 0Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052303630
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Gahlon, Rajaat (Used Until: 28 Aug 2019)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 321 - 50 Sunny Meadow Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6R 0Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052303630
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJAAT GIDDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIDDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJAAT GIDDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIDDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2019