THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:16:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa General Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa General Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Sep 2024
22 Sep 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 23 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 22 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOHN DAVID TRASK may practise orthopedic surgery with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Ottawa General Hospital in Ottawa, Ontario; and

(ii) Kemptville Hospital in Kemptville, Ontario; and

(iii) Hawkesbury General Hospital in Hawkesbury, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TRASK’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. TRASK’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. TRASK’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 23 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 22 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JOHN DAVID TRASK may practise orthopedic surgery with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Ottawa General Hospital in Ottawa, Ontario; and

(ii) Kemptville Hospital in Kemptville, Ontario; and

(iii) Hawkesbury General Hospital in Hawkesbury, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TRASK’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. TRASK’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. TRASK’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 23 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 22 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 22 Sep 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019