THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:56:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: RT Popa University of Medicine&Pharmacy, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: RT Popa University of Medicine&Pharmacy, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: RT Popa University of Medicine&Pharmacy, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
19 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 18 Nov 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
19 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 18 Nov 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery
23 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Ottawa
AVP - Vascular Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 19 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 18 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 19 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 18 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 23 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Vascular Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019