THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:27:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department Of Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department Of Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ALLAN DRIEDGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRIEDGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ALLAN DRIEDGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRIEDGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019