THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:54:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
University Health Network
Department of Medicine
Eaton Building
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond St
St Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
University Health Network
Department of Medicine
Eaton Building
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond St
St Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM AFZAL SULEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM AFZAL SULEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019