THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:22:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Khaled, Araf Mohammad (Used Until: 14 May 2019)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Khaled, Araf Mohammad (Used Until: 14 May 2019)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
26 Mar 2025 to 06 Apr 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Mar 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
16 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 15 Nov 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 26 Mar 2025 to 06 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 25 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 16 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 15 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019