THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:45:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 595 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3438825353
Fax: 3438823535
Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 595 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3438825353
Fax: 3438823535
Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASSIM KHALIL KARKACHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARKACHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WASSIM KHALIL KARKACHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARKACHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019