THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:36:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 07 Sep 2023
Summary:

Findings of Guilt


Anish Srinivasan Naidu was found guilty of the following offences:


1. 3 counts of Sexual Assault, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

2. 3 counts of Sexual Interference with a person under 16, contrary to Section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada
 

Date: May 10, 2023
 

SENTENCE: September 7, 2023
 

• 15 months imprisonment
• Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) for 20 years
• DNA Order
• 2 years probation (with conditions)
• Weapons prohibition order for 10 years


Probation Conditions:
1. Naidu must keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2. Naidu must appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3. Naidu must notify the court or probation officer in advance of any change of name of address and promptly notify the court or the probation officer of any change in employment or occupation.
4. Naidu must report in person or by phone to a probation officer within 2 working days (48 hours) of his release from custody and after that, at all times and places as directed by the probation officer or any person authorized by a probation officer to assist in his supervision.
5. Naidu must cooperate with his probation officer. He must sign any releases necessary to permit the probation officer to monitor his compliance and he must provide proof of compliance with any condition of this Order to his probation officer on request.
6. Naidu must not contact or communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named person.
7. Naidu must not be within 200 metres of any place where he knows named person to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place he knows named person to be except for required court attendances.
8. Naidu must not attend at or within 25 metres of named person.
9. Naidu must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
10. Naidu must attend and actively participate in all assessment, counselling or 
rehabilitative programs as directed by the probation officer and complete them to the satisfaction of the probation officer including, but not limited to: psychiatric or 
psychological issues, offence specific counselling.
11. Naidu shall sign any release of information forms as well enable his probation officer to monitor his attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed.
12. Naidu shall provide proof of his attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed.

 

APPEALED


Dr. Naidu appealed the decision. The Ontario Court of Appeal dismissed the appeal on April 8, 2025


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 07 Sep 2023
Summary:

Findings of Guilt


Anish Srinivasan Naidu was found guilty of the following offences:


1. 3 counts of Sexual Assault, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

2. 3 counts of Sexual Interference with a person under 16, contrary to Section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada
 

Date: May 10, 2023
 

SENTENCE: September 7, 2023
 

• 15 months imprisonment
• Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) for 20 years
• DNA Order
• 2 years probation (with conditions)
• Weapons prohibition order for 10 years


Probation Conditions:
1. Naidu must keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2. Naidu must appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3. Naidu must notify the court or probation officer in advance of any change of name of address and promptly notify the court or the probation officer of any change in employment or occupation.
4. Naidu must report in person or by phone to a probation officer within 2 working days (48 hours) of his release from custody and after that, at all times and places as directed by the probation officer or any person authorized by a probation officer to assist in his supervision.
5. Naidu must cooperate with his probation officer. He must sign any releases necessary to permit the probation officer to monitor his compliance and he must provide proof of compliance with any condition of this Order to his probation officer on request.
6. Naidu must not contact or communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named person.
7. Naidu must not be within 200 metres of any place where he knows named person to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place he knows named person to be except for required court attendances.
8. Naidu must not attend at or within 25 metres of named person.
9. Naidu must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
10. Naidu must attend and actively participate in all assessment, counselling or 
rehabilitative programs as directed by the probation officer and complete them to the satisfaction of the probation officer including, but not limited to: psychiatric or 
psychological issues, offence specific counselling.
11. Naidu shall sign any release of information forms as well enable his probation officer to monitor his attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed.
12. Naidu shall provide proof of his attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed.

 

APPEALED


Dr. Naidu appealed the decision. The Ontario Court of Appeal dismissed the appeal on April 8, 2025


Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019