Medical School:
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Jan 2026 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
17 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
01 Jul 2024 to 16 Jan 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
11 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
01 Jul 2023 to 10 Apr 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
11 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
01 Jul 2022 to 10 Apr 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics |
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
17 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 16 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
11 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 10 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
11 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 10 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE:
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa